Financial history WHITTINGTON COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 523205
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.45k £1.30k £19.68k £34.69k £33.74k
Total expenditure £62.57k £15.27k £21.84k £24.16k £37.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A