WORCESTER UNIT 378 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A uniformed charitable Maritime Youth Organisation providing education/training for people aged 10-18 years. Offering opportunities to learn water based activities, Drill, Piping, Marine Engineering, First Aid, Seamanship, Meteorology, cookery, based around Navy core values . Display skills/talents at competitions, public/ military parades, local fetes and fundraising/community service events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,300 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 24 February 1964: Standard registration
- T.S WORCESTER (Working name)
- WORCESTER SEA CADETS (Working name)
- UNIT 378, SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE HARVEY Chair | Chair | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hunt | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dorinda Ostermann H - S | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tony Wass Vice Chair | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Bluck Secretary | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Emma Butcher Event/FR | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hemingway Treasurer | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.98k | £28.65k | £21.62k | £17.25k | £24.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.72k | £10.20k | £15.54k | £24.68k | £27.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.83k | £300 | £2.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
WORCESTER AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worcester Sea Cadets Head Quarters
Great Western Avenue
off Midland Road
WORCESTER
WR5 1DU
- Phone:
- 07754 712869
- Email:
- admin@worcesterscc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window