PARISH ROOM CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of the parish hall for the use of the residents of Wyre Piddle and neighbourhood and in particular for use for meetings, lectures, classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 03 September 1963: Standard registration
- WYRE PIDDLE VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN MALKINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Philip Rowe | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Maddocks | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Lister | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Neal Gooderham | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Anne Monks | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Paul | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE SMITH | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
THELMA THOMAS | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM HADEN | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.41k | £10.87k | £14.58k | £4.92k | £7.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.48k | £10.57k | £5.19k | £13.46k | £5.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9 AUGUST 1963
Charitable objects
A PARISH ROOM.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WYRE PIDDLE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 HAINES AVENUE
WYRE PIDDLE
PERSHORE
WR10 2RQ
- Phone:
- 01386556102
- Email:
- malkinson@msn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window