YORK WOMEN'S COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1207150
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve the needs of women in the York area who are experiencing emotional and mental health difficulties or trauma by the provision of high-quality, low-cost counselling and support services.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of York
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 2024: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • YORK WOMENS COUNSELLING SERVICE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anjelica Finnegan Chair 07 February 2024
None on record
Imogen Bellerby Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Sarah Nicholson Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Jen Saunders Trustee 16 October 2024
None on record
Anna Lesley Reader Trustee 06 March 2023
None on record
Sally Jude Trustee 09 February 2022
YORK WOMENS COUNSELLING SERVICE
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
YORK CENTRE FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
PRIORY STREET CENTRE
15 PRIORY STREET
YORK
YO1 6ET
Phone:
01904652706