Financial history BARMSTON AND FRAISTHORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £14.15k £1.87k £3.52k £2.48k £3.79k
Total expenditure £8.49k £8.58k £4.98k £3.57k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.08k N/A N/A N/A N/A