BEVERLEY WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust provides a community building for arts, leisure, recreational and educational use. We offer a film night and now have excellent bar facilities. We offer meeting rooms, a stage, a large dance floor. The hall is available for wedding receptions, parties, conferences as well as educational use, to the whole community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Benson | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Chapman | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victor Richard Ellis | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MARK BRADBURY | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|||||
ERIC HERBERT ROUSTOBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL GLOVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUGH SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.22k | £88.40k | £88.24k | £85.18k | £110.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.04k | £75.28k | £88.44k | £96.92k | £104.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £71.41k | £31.17k | £20.00k | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 20 MARCH 1981
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEVERLEY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHBITANTS.
Area of benefit
BEVERLEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEVERLEY WAR MEMORIAL HALL TRUST
73-75 LAIRGATE
BEVERLEY
HU17 8HN
- Phone:
- 01482 880244
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window