VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity is to provide and maintain the Hall for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish and its environs without distinction of political, religious or other opinions etc, to advance education and provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreational and leisure-time activities with the object of improving the conditions of life for said inhabitants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 15 February 2024

Total income: £17,969
Total expenditure: £11,277

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BISHOP BURTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marc Steven Henderson Trustee 26 June 2023
None on record
Richard Bryn Jones Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
SUSAN PATRICIA ELLERINGTON Trustee
None on record
MARTIN GRAY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/02/2020 15/02/2021 15/02/2022 15/02/2023 15/02/2024
Total gross income £19.33k £22.36k £22.45k £16.47k £17.97k
Total expenditure £12.25k £5.21k £7.78k £8.78k £11.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.91k £10.10k £3.04k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 February 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 15 February 2023 14 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 15 February 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 15 February 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 February 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dunvegan
Pudding Gate
Bishop Burton
BEVERLEY
HU17 8QH
Phone:
01964551315
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available