THE MISS J FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness and to preserve and protect the health of the general public by: a. Educating on early diagnosis and prevention of breast cancer to increase awareness amongst the public through the delivery of activity sessions, presentations and the distribution of relevant literature; and b. The provision of grants to charities that are promoting breast cancer awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 January 2024: CIO registration
- THE MISS J FOUNDATION (Working name)
- PINKTOBER (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lara Daynes | Chair | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrius Sucharukovas | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norman Miller | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £479 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jan 2024 as amended on 01 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY: A. EDUCATING ON EARLY DIAGNOSIS AND PREVENTION OF BREAST CANCER TO INCREASE AWARENESS AMONGST THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE DELIVERY OF ACTIVITY SESSIONS, PRESENTATIONS AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF RELEVANT LITERATURE; AND B. THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES THAT ARE PROMOTING BREAST CANCER AWARENESS, PUBLISHING BREAST CANCER AWARENESS LITERATURE OR PROVIDING SUPPORT TO THOSE AFFECTED BY BREAST CANCER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
124 PALMER ROAD
NORWICH
NR3 3RN
- Phone:
- 07712288260
- Email:
- MISSJFOUNDATION@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window