Accounts and annual returns Elloughton-cum-Brough Playing Field Association

Charity number: 523236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 29 March 2024 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 15 March 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required