VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain Foston-On-The-Wolds village hall for the benefit of the community comprising the villages of Brigham, Foston, Gembling and Kelk in the East Riding of Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
Total income includes £9,786 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 03 January 1964: Standard registration
- FOSTON ON THE WOLDS VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY JOHN SELLERS | Chair |
|
||||||
David Seymour Watt | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET BRENDA ROBINSON | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.42k | £14.62k | £17.99k | £12.58k | £23.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.23k | £7.90k | £12.23k | £10.35k | £21.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.87k | £13.92k | £11.88k | £3.35k | £9.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 7TH APRIL 1952
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF FOSTON ON THE WOLDS, BRIGHAM, GREAT KELK AND GEMBLING.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oak Tree Farm
Foston-on-the-Wolds
DRIFFIELD
YO25 8BJ
- Phone:
- 01262481645
- Email:
- dswatt@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window