Accounts and annual returns HEMINGBROUGH INSTITUTE AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 523246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 June 2024 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 June 2024 507 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 March 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 March 2022 404 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required