HEMINGBROUGH INSTITUTE AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity Number: 523246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Playing Fields Association provides and maintains sports and recreational facilities for the benefit of all age groups in the community. It also provides in-door facilities for pre-school and out of school educational groups as well as local group activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,393
Total expenditure: £13,114

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gary Johnson Chair 05 June 2018
None on record
Leo Howard Trustee 28 May 2024
None on record
Alan Mark Tomlinson Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Ann Tomlinson Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Gillian Tomlinson Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Stuart Bennett Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
HARRY JACKSON Trustee 29 April 2015
None on record
NEIL TOMLINSON Trustee 29 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.27k £4.99k £4.71k £6.61k £16.39k
Total expenditure £10.54k £12.66k £14.74k £7.31k £13.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 June 2024 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 June 2024 507 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 March 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 March 2022 404 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bishop Meadows Farm
Babthorpe Hemingbrough
SELBY
North Yorkshire
YO8 6EH
Phone:
07816155945
Website:

No information available