Trustees HEMINGBROUGH INSTITUTE AND PLAYING FIELDS
Charity Number: 523246

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Johnson | Chair | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leo Howard | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Mark Tomlinson | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Tomlinson | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Tomlinson | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Bennett | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
HARRY JACKSON | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
NEIL TOMLINSON | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.