HOLME-ON-SPALDING-MOOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of village hall and playing fields
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 April 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr R Brook | Chair | 11 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mrs P M Laverack | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Waudby | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ms L Ratcliffe | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ms C Kean | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mr B Denness | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.33k | £38.58k | £15.45k | £41.10k | £27.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.44k | £20.94k | £36.29k | £45.17k | £29.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.63k | £8.00k | £3.04k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2025 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2025 | 174 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2025 | 540 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2025 | 540 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH SEPTEMBER, 1967
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
HOLME UPON SPALDING MOOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Holme Village Hall
60 High Street
Holme on Spalding Moor
York
YO43 4EN
- Phone:
- 07930 891035
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window