COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CHESTERFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with a fabulous group of positive volunteers who help us provide the younger Community of Chesterfield with the vital experiences they deserve. Children have so much to offer to the world - we believe in the power that they hold, and know that they will mold future generations to come. At CDC, we are here to give them the support they need in order to shape them into leaders of the future
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £27,900 from 10 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 30 January 2024: CIO registration
- CDC GROUP (Working name)
- THE ROTHER ACTIVE YOUTH CLUB (THE RAY CLUB) (Working name)
- TUPTON FOODBANK (Working name)
- Walton Knitters (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danny Mark Pawelski Henman | Chair | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leann Parsons | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Eleanor Wright | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Emily Tidmarsh | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Flood | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF CHESTERFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO- OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CDC Cosy Hub
BURNS CLOSE
CHESTERFIELD
- Phone:
- 07849113356
- Email:
- info@cdchesterfield.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window