ROYSTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable ...
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

22 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 February 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Charity Nzegwu | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
James Martin Browne | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Shepherd | Trustee | 18 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Alfred Norwood | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL REGINALD HARRIS | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Myra Walter | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Watson | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Patricia Black | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Joy Tillson | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hindley | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Margaret Munden | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Garrick | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE HARRIS | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY DAVID MADDIN | Trustee | 11 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Kathleen Keep | Trustee | 11 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Hindley | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NICHOLAS HERBERT KEEP | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
DAVID PHILIP JAMES AGGETT | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Leslie Grainger | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Pauline Grainger | Trustee | 13 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Maddin | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE MARY GOODALL | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 02 JAN 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYSTON METHODIST CHURCH
QUEENS ROAD
ROYSTON
SG8 7AU
- Phone:
- 01763243849
- Website:
-
WWW.ROYSTON-METHODIST.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window