THE ND HARBOUR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The ND Harbour provides emotional support, social opportunities, peer support, psychoeducation, and specialised mental health support for neurodivergent people.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 27 June 2024: CIO registration
- THE HARBOUR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roisin Mae Arnold | Chair | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Moradeke Ogunrekun | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Apter | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Semenova | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Davis | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST ADULTS AND CHILDREN WHO IDENTIFY AS NEURODIVERGENT AND THEIR FAMILIES, WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING NEURODIVERGENT BY THE PROVISION OF: A CRÈCHE, PLAY SCHEME, COMMUNITY SPACE, DROP-IN SUPPORT, PEER SUPPORT GROUPS, EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT CENTRE TO ENABLE NEURODIVERGENT CHILDREN AND ADULTS TO DEVELOP AND GAIN NEW SKILLS. 2. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL ILL HEALTH OF NEURODIVERGENT PEOPLE LIVING IN KENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LOW OR NO-COST THERAPEUTIC SERVICES AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE PRECEDING CLAUSES, “NEURODIVERGENT” IS DEFINED AS ANY PERSON DIAGNOSED OR SELF-IDENTIFYING WITH ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING CONDITIONS: AUTISM, ADHD/ADD, DYSLEXIA, DYSPRAXIA, DYSCALCULIA, OR ANY OTHER NEUROTYPES GENERALLY ACCEPTED TO BE NEURODIVERGENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 1243
Canterbury
CT1 9UR
- Phone:
- 07718644896
- Email:
- jo@ndharbour.org.uk
- Website:
-
ndharbour.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.