Financial history THIXENDALE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.62k £1.26k £14.15k £7.50k £7.48k
Total expenditure £16.23k £6.39k £10.22k £14.09k £14.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.67k N/A N/A