WETWANG VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall hired to various members of the local community and anyone wishing to use the facilities. The hall is used for badminton, karate, toddler group, school gym sessions, Country Women, Parish Council, etc. Additionally the village run an annual scarecrow festival which raises funds for the hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £2,700 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,781 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 12 February 1964: Standard registration
- WETWANG VILLAGE COMMUNITY HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Robin Taylor | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Stanley | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Andrews | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Taylor | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Wager | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Turpin | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrews | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.06k | £20.43k | £32.95k | £19.91k | £23.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.02k | £20.38k | £24.55k | £41.30k | £30.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.25k | £2.25k | £2.25k | £2.25k | £2.70k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.50k | £23.04k | £3.31k | £1.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1936 AND AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 6 DECEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WETWANG AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southfield Well Balk
Wetwang
Driffield
East Yorkshire
YO25 9XX
- Phone:
- 01377236572
- Email:
- wetwangvillagehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window