YAPHAM-CUM-MELTONBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To sustain Yapham village hall for the use of residents of Yapham-cum-Meltonby Parish and its neighbourhood and, in particular, encourage its use for meetings, lectures, education classes and for all other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation, with the object of improving quality of life for residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 09 November 1961: Standard registration
- YAPHAM PARISH HALL FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH MOVERLEY | Chair | 11 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
Erland Mooney | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alasdair Charles William Firth | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE ELIZABETH WHITING | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROBERT FOURACRE | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARGARET HUTCHINSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.50k | £10.43k | £15.69k | £5.28k | £6.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.50k | £1.82k | £4.35k | £6.13k | £4.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.20k | £13.13k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 OCTOBER 1961
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
YAPHAM CUM MELTONBY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Yapham
YORK
YO42 1PH
- Phone:
- 07749471480
- Email:
- d_fouracre@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window