BURNISTON AND CLOUGHTON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Village Hall and Playing Fields for the use of residents of the villages of Burniston and Cloughton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,200 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 November 1964: Standard registration
- BURNISTON AND CLOUGHTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- BURNISTON AND CLOUGHTON VILLAGE (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Backhouse | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Whelan | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Birley | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Tamblin | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Webb | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Kitching | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MR P TIDD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERRY OULTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.47k | £19.58k | £55.52k | £37.71k | £46.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.91k | £17.18k | £22.00k | £70.86k | £54.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.43k | £4.29k | £4.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 9 MARCH 1981 as amended on 12 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF PLAYING FIELDS, RECREATION GROUNDS AND A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BURNISTON, CLOUGHTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BURNISTON, CLOUGHTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burniston & Cloughton Village Hall
High Street
Burniston
SCARBOROUGH
North Yorkshire
YO13 0HJ
- Phone:
- 01723643003
- Email:
- hire@bcvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window