DANBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 523340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide the facilities for the whole community. The village hall is available to anybody for hire. Individuals can book the hall for personal use ie weddings, parties etc. Weekly activities include senior citizens meetings, short mat bowls and badminton clubs. The local primary school use the hall for larger functions than the school can cater for, including their Christmas Play.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £67,894
Total expenditure: £36,379

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chloe Thompson Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Graeme Pallister Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Lonsdale Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £5.06k £1.79k £4.32k £9.93k £67.89k
Total expenditure £4.39k £5.60k £5.44k £27.57k £36.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £44.19k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 28 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 14 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 22 AUGUST 1966
Charitable objects
THE UPKEEP, PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE VILLAGE HALL AT DANBY
Area of benefit
DANBY
Registration history
  • 11 May 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
1 Dale End
Danby
WHITBY
North Yorkshire
YO21 2JF
Phone:
07944180981
Website:

No information available