Financial history AYTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.39k £19.75k £25.88k £22.53k £16.26k
Total expenditure £30.87k £15.01k £11.24k £19.29k £21.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £12.53k £16.38k £2.67k N/A