Trustees AYTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 523344

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK PHILLIPS | Chair | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Blenkiron | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hardcastle | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY YVONNE WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dave Rogers | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Garbutt | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Jeffells | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE MARY CUSSONS | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAY WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 06 February 2016 |
|
|||||
STEVE GARBUTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.