Trustees EAST HARLSEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 523345

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR PHILIP BAILEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Greenwood | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christina Fickling | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janette Anderson | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Lax | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Moore | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Crowley | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Gilliland | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kime | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Buckingham | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Lane | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gill Selby | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEAH WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.