Trustees EBBERSTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 523346
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH CLAIRE WINTERS | Chair |
|
||||||
Julie Askew | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Watson | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ross | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Rowe | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wedgwood Walker | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Denise Johnson | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Kirby | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE HEPPLESTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE HALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.