HEROES OLD ENGLISH SHEEPDOG REHOMING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide for the general public Support, Rescue and Rehoming for Old English Sheepdogs and Associated Cross Breeds in need of care and attention and, in particular, to provide foster & adoption homes or other facilities for the reception, care and treatment. We also provide owners of the breed help and guidance on care, as well as any other organisations we can support relating to the breed.
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 June 2024: Standard registration
- HEROES REHOMING (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean Norwood | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly James | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Marchant-Haycox | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Freeman | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Norwood | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS NAMELY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OLD ENGLISH SHEEPDOGS AND ASSOCIATED CROSS BREEDS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOGS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 GREENWAY AVENUE
STONE
ST15 0ER
- Phone:
- 07773025142
- Email:
- info@heroesrehoming.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.