GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 523354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

snooker club. games for the elderly, w.i. meetings and activities, parish council meetings.village concerts, film shows,public parties and events.Council/national elections.Chapel fund raising.Village fund raising events. Sales for charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,070
Total expenditure: £3,912

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID BRYAN CRAPPER Chair
THOMLINSON TRUST
Received: On time
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Susan Anne Flather Trustee 25 October 2023
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Sally Margaret Eady Trustee 03 May 2023
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Ian Wharton Trustee 12 March 2023
SWALEDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM
Received: On time
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
KELD RESOURCE CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
John Gilleard Trustee 16 November 2022
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
SWALEDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM
Received: On time
Gail Crisp Trustee 01 December 2020
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Jane Laura Beaumont Trustee 01 February 2019
None on record
Jacqueline McCartney Trustee 09 March 2017
None on record
CHRISTOPHER GEORGE WATTS Trustee 26 January 2012
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
EASINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
EILEEN JANE KILPATRICK Trustee
GUNNERSIDE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.74k £1.17k £9.94k £4.72k £4.07k
Total expenditure £4.63k £3.71k £4.96k £5.38k £3.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CORNER COTTAGE
GUNNERSIDE
nr Richmond
nr Richmond
NORTH YORKSHIRE
DL11 6LE
Phone:
01748886878