PRUDHOE COMMUNITY CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By providing accessible rehearsals, open to all, at an affordable price, while performing at a number of events for low or no price. There is no audition or requirement to be able to read music to join, emphasis is put on inclusivity in mangement of the choir. Guidance on reading music is given in rehearsals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northumberland
Governance
- 23 April 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Benjamin Mitchell | Chair | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ray Moore | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ashton-Smith | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Kay | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Breen | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Cope | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brunskill | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Averil Shepherd | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Edge | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 APR 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
STOCKSFIELD BAPTIST CHURCH
MAIN ROAD
STOCKSFIELD
NE43 7DU
- Phone:
- 01661843285
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window