SCARISBRICK HALL SCHOOL PFA

Charity number: 1206593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raise money for charitable purposes in line with the governance document for Scarisbrick Hall school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £17,440
Total expenditure: £15,657

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 January 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Moore Chair
None on record
Rebecca Alison Whitaker Trustee 01 September 2024
FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS SCHOOL, APPLEY BRIDGE
Received: On time
Amanda Jane Sharma Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Helen Saffer-Cartwright Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Kelly Nicholl Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Nicola Jackson Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Michelle Ball Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Janet Carley Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Joanna Harrison Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.44k
Total expenditure £15.66k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Scarisbrick Hall
Southport Road
Scarisbrick
Ormskirk
L40 9RQ
Phone:
01704841151