THE BFG (BROOKSIDE FUNDRAISING GROUP)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide funding to the school to support a variety of different activities that enhance the children's experience. These range from entertainment activities such as film nights and discos, through to funding school trips, funding SENCO equipment and supporting the school with the OPAL play initiative; all of which are held at the school.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Standeven | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jayne Miller | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Clark | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natascha Birch | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Hainsley | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Cockbill | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leah Clare Standeven | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROOKSIDE PRIMARY SCHOOL
SCHOOL GREEN
EAST LEAKE
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 6LG
- Phone:
- 01509820001
- Email:
- hello@the-bfg.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.