Governing document Newton on Ouse Community Association

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28/07/1953 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13 OCT 2022 as amended on 25 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECT IS TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NEWTON ON OUSE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NEWTON-ON-OUSE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.