Trustees Newton on Ouse Community Association
Charity number: 523392

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew William Dalton | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Bainbridge | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Keats | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paulette Wright | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pascha Rachael Jane Turnbull | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Robert Nelson | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Allison | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
GLENDA RACHAEL TURNBULL | Trustee | 10 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CALVERT | Trustee | 12 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.