NUNTHORPE AND MARTON PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sporting Facilities, Squash, Cricket, Football, Tennis, Quoits. Running
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 13 April 1965: Standard registration
- PLAYING FIELDS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Foggin | Chair | 17 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Carole Morgan | Trustee | 21 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wade James Tovey MBE TD MSc | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Kelvin Bowes | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Morgan McClintock | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Shaefer | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Barry Hutchinson | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Spaldin | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bell | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Boyd Morrish | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.52k | £48.40k | £62.07k | £87.99k | £30.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.90k | £30.15k | £62.47k | £93.09k | £41.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.50k | £20.68k | £1.12k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 September 2024 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 September 2024 | 239 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 17 FEBRUARY 1965 AND 23 OCTOBER 1967
Charitable objects
PLAYING FIELDS FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
NUNTHORPE, MARTON AND PART OF ORMESBY,
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nunthorpe & Marton Recreation Club
Guisborough Road
Nunthorpe
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS7 0JA
- Phone:
- 01642313251
- Email:
- info@nmpfa.org.uk
- Website:
-
nmpfa.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window