OSWALDKIRK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall provides facilities for the local community. Provides the resources and amenities for diverse activities including art groups, pilates, dancing and community events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 05 November 1971: Standard registration
- 13 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1199570 OSWALDKIRK VILLAGE HALL CIO
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER DEXTER-SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lisa Halmshaw | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Mary Dunne | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Mike Aherne | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|||||
DAVID GEORGE BADHAM | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ELIZABETH GOODMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.66k | £21.57k | £16.59k | £8.29k | £529 | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.50k | £8.97k | £28.23k | £15.47k | £14.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.50k | £19.43k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 12TH DECEMBER 1946 AND DEED OF GIFT DATED 28TH JUNE 1950 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2022
Charitable objects
THE TRUST PREMISES SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES RECREATIONS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF OSWALDKIRK IN THE COUNTY OF YORK AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. (CHARITABLE TRUSTS VALIDATION ACT 1954 APPLIED)
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIGG COTTAGE
THE TERRACE
OSWALDKIRK
YORK
YO62 5XZ
- Phone:
- 01439787111
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window