SHIPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 523412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of community centre for local groups to use

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £14,184
Total expenditure: £10,296

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SHIPTON COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN ANDREW JORDAN Chair
None on record
Jonathan Andrew Cutt Trustee 27 August 2024
None on record
Claire Mawson Trustee
MIDDLETON SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.47k £14.09k £3.01k £12.52k £14.18k
Total expenditure £8.82k £5.17k £7.00k £8.90k £10.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Shipton Community Centre
Main Street
Shipton by Beningbrough
YORK
YO30 1AA
Phone:
01904470864
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available