Trustees STOCKTON-ON-TEES UNIT 319 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity Number: 523420

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Ivor Simpson | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Luker | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Stuart Holley | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leslie Mead | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Hume | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Christine Simpson | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Henry Hopkins | Trustee | 18 April 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.