BILLINGHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 523426
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Total income: £9,243
Total expenditure: £9,760
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
Registration history:
- 29 June 1967: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 October 2009: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £535 | £1.00k | £1.00k | £8.58k | £9.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £535 | £1.00k | £1.00k | £5.13k | £9.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 21 October 2009 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 24 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION FEBRUARY 1957, AS AMENDED 26TH FEBRUARY 1965
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
URBAN DISTRICT OF BILLINGHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window