CAMVALE TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Camvale Tennis Club continually promotes participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for playing, learning and teaching tennis for the benefit of the local community. A range of activities are made available to both members and non-members with minimal cost to enable access and enjoyment to many.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
Governance
- 26 January 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Theed | Chair | 28 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Carole Spencer | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Bryant | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ronald Dando | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING, LEARNING AND TEACHING TENNIS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PAULTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAM VALLEY SPORTS CLUB
20 BRISTOL ROAD
PAULTON
BS39 7NX
- Phone:
- 07801910829
- Email:
- ian.camvaletc@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window