Accounts and annual returns TEESVILLE AND LOWFIELDS WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 523430
Charity reporting is overdue by 1482 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 386 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 386 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 752 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 752 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1117 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1117 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1482 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1482 days