NORTHCOTE ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian church and faith space on Northcote Road. We have a Sunday service every week at 11am.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 21 March 2024: Standard registration
- NORTHCOTE CHURCH (Working name)
- THE CHURCH ON NORTHCOTE ROAD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Darren Maurice Powell | Chair | 29 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aline Esther Xavier | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Moo Tein Ni | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Felipe Figueiredo Goncalves | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erika Pedrinha Guimaraes | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northcote Road Baptist Church
Northcote Road
Battersea
SW11 6QW
- Phone:
- 02079677831
- Email:
- hello@northcote.church
- Website:
-
northcote.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.