THORNTON-LE-BEANS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Letting and maintaining Thornton-le-Beans Village Hall and organizing the Annual Show and Children's Sports Day in the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 12 December 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Verity Ann Jefferson | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Linthwaite | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BAKER | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA MARGARET LINTHWAITE | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.63k | £4.60k | £5.86k | £11.14k | £14.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.74k | £9.90k | £3.64k | £8.81k | £11.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/01/1953
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THORNTON-LE-BEANS AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thornton House
Thornton le Beans
NORTHALLERTON
DL6 3SP
- Phone:
- 01609761337
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window