LAZENBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hiring of Village Hall for various community activities such as Dancing Class, Dog Club, Wine & Beer Circle, Parties, Church Activities. The Hall is usually hired by the local villagers and the people in the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 11 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Costello | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Catherine Ann Blackett | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Robinson | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Walker Louise | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANDY SYKES | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.76k | £3.31k | £9.00k | £12.60k | £13.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.45k | £18.59k | £11.72k | £15.01k | £9.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 7TH APRIL 1961
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WILTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Wilton Green
Lazenby
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS6 8DP
- Phone:
- 01642 454123
- Email:
- lazenbyvh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window