WORSALL VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 523448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

It provides and maintains a Village Hall in Worsall as a focus for community activities, seeking to meet the established and future needs of the community regardless of age, ethnic origin or disability. It offers flexible accommodation appropriate for the activities of the major user groups, recreational/educational and social events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £26,642
Total expenditure: £21,041

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 March 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT BRIAN BAINBRIDGE Chair
STOCKTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
YARM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Stuart Penny Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record
Andrew Clift Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record
Wilson Drummond Trustee 05 October 2020
None on record
Ken Twiss Trustee 05 October 2020
None on record
Suzanne Guy Trustee 20 October 2019
None on record
David Bivens Trustee 01 November 2018
None on record
GILLIAN RUTH BAINBRIDGE Trustee 16 April 2018
YARM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Christine Graham Trustee 02 November 2015
None on record
SUSAN HARKER Trustee 15 October 2014
None on record
JANE ALDERSON Trustee 14 February 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOCKBURN IN THE DIOCESE OF DURHAM
Recently registered
Deborah Scott Bivens Trustee 01 January 2008
None on record
Martin Sutton Trustee 01 January 2005
STOKESLEY & DISTRICT U3A
Received: On time
Dr HOWARD LEIGH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £29.85k £4.28k £25.07k £24.19k £26.64k
Total expenditure £29.03k £40.85k £10.07k £16.93k £21.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £2.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 10 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 07 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 10 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 02 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Worsall Manor Farms Ltd
Low Worsall
Yarm
TS15 9PJ
Phone:
01642780695
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available