BRITISH PHILOSOPHICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1208038
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The BPA seeks to: Promote the study of Philosophy particularly within higher and secondary education, but also within the wider community Assist professional philosophers in carrying out their teaching, scholarship and research in Philosophy Foster interest in, and appreciation of Philosophy in the wider community Express the views of the community of professional philosophers in Britain

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 2024: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Fiona Macpherson Chair 22 February 2019
None on record
Dr Jennifer Renee Corns Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Professor Martin Patrick O'Neill Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr Julian Baggini Trustee 13 September 2024
THE FOOD ETHICS COUNCIL
Received: On time
Professor Rosanna Jancis Keefe Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr Ian James Kidd Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Professor Christian Sophia Grace Chappell Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr Derek Henry Brown Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Robert Christopher Penney Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Professor Fiona Jane Woollard Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Professor Heather Gillian Widdows Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr Joshua Ian Forstenzer Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Dr Garrath Williams Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record
Professor Simon Kirchin Trustee 27 May 2014
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
LANCASTER UNIVERSITY
Dept Politics Philosophy Religion
BAILRIGG
LANCASTER
LA1 4YL
Phone:
0152465201