Trustees THE HELICOPTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1208547
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire apRees Chair 06 June 2024
None on record
David John Poxon Trustee 06 May 2025
None on record
Alan Norris Trustee 06 May 2025
None on record
Colin James Spence Trustee 17 April 2025
None on record
Jennifer Mary Mortimore Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Adrian Brimson Trustee 28 March 2025
None on record
Lucia Cumming Trustee 06 June 2024
None on record
Lilianna Cumming Trustee 06 June 2024
None on record