OUSEDALE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Ousedale PTA is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular: developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and other associated with the school. Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 26 February 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Caroline Barrass PHD | Chair | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Seward MSC | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rosemary Fergusson PHD | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Stock | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Johnstone B.A HONS | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Seward HND | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ursula Watkins | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Bibby | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Phipps DBA | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Beasley ACCA | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Margaret Shotton | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ousedale School, The Grove
Newport Pagnell
Buckinghamshire
MK16 0BJ
- Phone:
- 07812011239
- Email:
- ASHOTS@ME.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window