THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EDMUND OR ST JAMES, BLUNHAM

Charity number: 1208324
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 May 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PCC OF BLUNHAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Graham Charles Buckle Chair
None on record
Geoffrey Paul McCulloch Trustee 28 April 2024
BLUNHAM GOOD NEIGHBOUR SCHEME
Received: On time
Rev Christopher Scott Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
Sylvia Cary Elwes Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Philip Anthony Rose Trustee 25 April 2021
BLUNHAM GOOD NEIGHBOUR SCHEME
Received: On time
BLUNHAM VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
KATHRYN TIPPING Trustee 27 January 1972
None on record
Dr Roy Tipping PhD Trustee
None on record
Susan Dodson Trustee
None on record
Amanda Jane Harvey-Wade Trustee
None on record
Maureen Munro Trustee
None on record
Shelagh Ashley Trustee
None on record
EMMA RUTH FORBES-LAIRD Trustee
None on record
Paul Vincent Canty Trustee
None on record
Patricia Anne Warlow Trustee
None on record
Lee Andrew Harrison Trustee
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
The Old Rectory
Park Lane Blunham
BEDFORD
MK44 3NJ
Phone:
01767640412
Website:

No information available