GO FULL STEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are, for the benefit of the public, to advance the skills and mental health of young people in London in particular, but not exclusively, through the provision of STEAM subjects (Science, Technology, Engineering, the Arts, and Mathematics).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 07 June 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Massimo Borghetto | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Tien-Chye Tan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Margarita Borbala Kopniczky | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN LONDON IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION IN STEAM SUBJECTS (SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING, THE ARTS, AND MATHEMATICS). 3.2 NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GO FULL STEAM
8-12 CAMDEN HIGH STREET
LONDON
NW1 0JH
- Phone:
- 07557499713
- Email:
- gofullsteam@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window