ST ANDREW'S READING ROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Village Hall / Reading Room
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
Governance
- 06 April 1972: Standard registration
- BISHOPTHORPE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEWART PETER HARRISON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sally Astbury Mrs | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Thornton | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL NICOLLS | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN GEORGE | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS GAJEWICZ | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ANN GREEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
IAN ARTHUR JEMISON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.71k | £1.64k | £11.50k | £11.56k | £14.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.50k | £9.99k | £14.37k | £21.62k | £23.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 4TH JANUARY 1904
Charitable objects
A READING ROOM FOR THE USE OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA OR WITHIN SUCH FURTHER LIMITS AS THE TRUSTEES OR TRUSTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BISHOPTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
VILLAGE HALL
40 MAIN STREET
BISHOPTHORPE
YORK
YO23 2RB
- Phone:
- 01904709015
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window